MA S1916 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H2915
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-14 - Accompanied H2915
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-14 - Accompanied H2915
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to authorize the establishment of a mean tested senior citizen property tax exemption. Revenue.
Title
Authorizing the establishment of a mean tested senior citizen property tax exemption
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-14 | House | Accompanied H2915 |
2022-04-01 | House | House concurred |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Amendment (changing reporting date to Wednesday April 6, 2022) adopted, pending concurrence |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Wednesday April 6, 2022, pending concurrence |
2022-02-09 | House | Reporting date extended to Wednesday March 30, 2022, pending concurrence |
2021-12-14 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 12/28/2021 from 10:00 AM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
H3732 (Similar To) 2022-04-14 - Accompanied H2915
H3901 (Similar To) 2022-10-19 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 241 of the Acts of 2022
S5 (Similar To) 2021-06-09 - Amendment again agreed to - see Senate Roll Call #48 and House Roll Call #38 (Yeas 159 to Nays 41)
H3766 (Similar To) 2022-07-06 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 100 of the Acts of 2022
H3767 (Similar To) 2023-01-05 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 390 of the Acts of 2022
H3989 (Similar To) 2022-09-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 225 of the Acts of 2022
S2512 (Similar To) 2022-09-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 210 of the Acts of 2022
H4107 (Similar To) 2022-04-28 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S1842 (Similar To) 2022-07-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4997
H2887 (Similar To) 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4894
S788 (Similar To) 2022-10-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H5352
S1912 (Similar To) 2022-04-14 - Accompanied S1878
H2979 (Similar To) 2022-10-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H5352
H2980 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5250
S1930 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5250
S1858 (Similar To) 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4894
S1856 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5250
S1808 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2915 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H3024 (Similar To) 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5245
H3731 (Similar To) 2022-08-24 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 193 of the Acts of 2022
H3064 (Similar To) 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5245
H3901 (Similar To) 2022-10-19 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 241 of the Acts of 2022
S5 (Similar To) 2021-06-09 - Amendment again agreed to - see Senate Roll Call #48 and House Roll Call #38 (Yeas 159 to Nays 41)
H3766 (Similar To) 2022-07-06 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 100 of the Acts of 2022
H3767 (Similar To) 2023-01-05 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 390 of the Acts of 2022
H3989 (Similar To) 2022-09-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 225 of the Acts of 2022
S2512 (Similar To) 2022-09-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 210 of the Acts of 2022
H4107 (Similar To) 2022-04-28 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S1842 (Similar To) 2022-07-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4997
H2887 (Similar To) 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4894
S788 (Similar To) 2022-10-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H5352
S1912 (Similar To) 2022-04-14 - Accompanied S1878
H2979 (Similar To) 2022-10-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H5352
H2980 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5250
S1930 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5250
S1858 (Similar To) 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4894
S1856 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5250
S1808 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2915 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H3024 (Similar To) 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5245
H3731 (Similar To) 2022-08-24 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 193 of the Acts of 2022
H3064 (Similar To) 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5245
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S1916 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S1916.pdf |