MA H3088 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4562
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-2)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4562
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4562
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to commuter transit tax benefits. Revenue.
Title
Relative to commuter transit benefits
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-04 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4562 |
2021-12-14 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 12/22/2021 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-12-14 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/12/2022 from 10:00 AM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-12-08 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 12/13/2021 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
H3050 (Similar To) 2022-04-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4562
S1890 (Similar To) 2022-04-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4562
S1218 (Similar To) 2022-03-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2720
H4562 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1890 (Similar To) 2022-04-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4562
S1218 (Similar To) 2022-03-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2720
H4562 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3088 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3088.pdf |