MA H3105 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4874
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the definition of custody in care and protection of children proceedings. The Judiciary.
Title
Relative to the definition of custody in protection and care of children proceedings
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-09 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4874 |
2017-05-01 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/15/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 & A-2 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S1273 (Similar To) 2018-07-31 - New draft substituted, see S2643
H2216 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4528
S701 (Similar To) 2017-10-02 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H89 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H1217 (Similar To) 2018-01-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4109
H187 (Similar To) 2017-07-26 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H109 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H981 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H881 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H926 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H934 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
S2070 (Similar To) 2017-07-20 - Accompanied H3740
H3944 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
S2125 (Similar To) 2017-07-27 - See H3740
H47 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2500
H3740 (Similar To) 2017-11-14 - Reported by H4032
S2259 (Similar To) 2018-01-25 - Referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4874 (Replaced by) 2018-08-09 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H2216 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4528
S701 (Similar To) 2017-10-02 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H89 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H1217 (Similar To) 2018-01-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4109
H187 (Similar To) 2017-07-26 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H109 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H981 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H881 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H926 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H934 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
S2070 (Similar To) 2017-07-20 - Accompanied H3740
H3944 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
S2125 (Similar To) 2017-07-27 - See H3740
H47 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2500
H3740 (Similar To) 2017-11-14 - Reported by H4032
S2259 (Similar To) 2018-01-25 - Referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4874 (Replaced by) 2018-08-09 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H3105 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H3105.pdf |