MA H3220 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4305
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4305
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4305
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to further define the term “gateway municipality”. Economic Development and Emerging Technologies.
Title
Relative to gateway communities
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-18 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4305 |
2015-09-04 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/15/2015 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in UMass Lowell Innovation Hub |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Economic Development and Emerging Technologies |
Same As/Similar To
H4305 (Replaced by) 2016-05-18 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H1606 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H2830 (Similar To) 2015-11-02 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H1607 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H2916 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Accompanied a study order, see H4177
H2831 (Similar To) 2016-03-10 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H1606 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H2830 (Similar To) 2015-11-02 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H1607 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H2916 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Accompanied a study order, see H4177
H2831 (Similar To) 2016-03-10 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3220 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3220.pdf |