MA H4305 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: For complete list of accompanied drafts and orders please see the SAST list.
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on May 18 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-18 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 18 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-18 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Economic development matters
Title
Economic development matters
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-18 | House | Discharged to the committee on House Rules |
2016-05-18 | House | Order reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Joint Rules |
2016-05-18 | House | Accompanied by H283, H284, H285, H287, H289, H290, H291, H292, H293, H294, H299, H303, H3220 and H3386 |
2016-05-18 | House | Reported from the committee on Economic Development and Emerging Technologies |
Same As/Similar To
H283 (Replaces) 2016-05-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4305
H284 (Replaces) 2016-05-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4305
H285 (Replaces) 2016-05-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4305
H287 (Replaces) 2016-05-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4305
H289 (Replaces) 2016-05-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4305
H290 (Replaces) 2016-05-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4305
H291 (Replaces) 2016-05-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4305
H292 (Replaces) 2016-05-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4305
H293 (Replaces) 2016-05-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4305
H294 (Replaces) 2016-05-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4305
H299 (Replaces) 2016-05-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4305
H303 (Replaces) 2016-05-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4305
H3220 (Replaces) 2016-05-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4305
H3386 (Replaces) 2016-05-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4305
H3660 (Similar To) 2016-07-07 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S1971 (Similar To) 2015-11-05 - New draft substituted, see S2044
S1970 (Similar To) 2015-07-30 - New draft substituted, see S1982
S2041 (Similar To) 2016-02-24 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 46 of the Acts of 2016
S2134 (Similar To) 2016-03-21 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H284 (Replaces) 2016-05-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4305
H285 (Replaces) 2016-05-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4305
H287 (Replaces) 2016-05-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4305
H289 (Replaces) 2016-05-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4305
H290 (Replaces) 2016-05-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4305
H291 (Replaces) 2016-05-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4305
H292 (Replaces) 2016-05-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4305
H293 (Replaces) 2016-05-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4305
H294 (Replaces) 2016-05-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4305
H299 (Replaces) 2016-05-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4305
H303 (Replaces) 2016-05-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4305
H3220 (Replaces) 2016-05-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4305
H3386 (Replaces) 2016-05-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4305
H3660 (Similar To) 2016-07-07 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S1971 (Similar To) 2015-11-05 - New draft substituted, see S2044
S1970 (Similar To) 2015-07-30 - New draft substituted, see S1982
S2041 (Similar To) 2016-02-24 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 46 of the Acts of 2016
S2134 (Similar To) 2016-03-21 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H4305 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H4305.pdf |