MA H3386 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4305
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4305
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4305
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to promote the hiring of residents for permanent and construction jobs created by the Economic Development Incentive Program. Economic Development and Emerging Technologies.
Title
Creating construction relevance in the Economic Development Incentive Program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-18 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4305 |
2015-07-15 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 07/15/2015 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in B-2 |
2015-07-15 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 07/15/2015 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-2 |
2015-07-06 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/15/2015 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in B-2 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Economic Development and Emerging Technologies |
Same As/Similar To
H4305 (Replaced by) 2016-05-18 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3386 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3386.pdf |