MA H3272 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5081
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to providing protection against compelled disclosure of certain information by members of the news media. The Judiciary.
Title
Relative to the free flow of information
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-12 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5081 |
2019-06-07 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/17/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
H1063 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
H3553 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4403
H3842 (Similar To) 2020-11-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H5090
H5081 (Replaced by) 2020-11-12 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H3553 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4403
H3842 (Similar To) 2020-11-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H5090
H5081 (Replaced by) 2020-11-12 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3272 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3272.pdf |