MA H340 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4582
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 43-11)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-08-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4582
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-08-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4582
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to providing a public education system of sufficient quality. Education.
Title
Relative to a moratorium on high stakes testing and PARCC
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-08-18 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4582 |
2015-05-26 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/11/2015 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Education |
Same As/Similar To
H4582 (Replaced by) 2016-08-18 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H828 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4111
H339 (Similar To) 2015-09-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3754
H1922 (Similar To) 2016-05-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4242
H3501 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
H1256 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H828 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4111
H339 (Similar To) 2015-09-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3754
H1922 (Similar To) 2016-05-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4242
H3501 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
H1256 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H340 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H340.pdf |