MA H3519 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H3614
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on June 17 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-08-23 - Accompanied H3614
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 17 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-08-23 - Accompanied H3614
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Bill Title: An Act authorizing the town of Dedham to grant 3 additional licenses for the sale of all alcoholic beverages to be drunk on the premises By Representative McMurtry of Dedham and Senator Rush, a joint petition of Paul McMurtry and Michael F. Rush (by vote of the town) that the town of Dedham be authorized to grant three additional licenses for the sale of all alcoholic beverages to be drunk on the premises. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Authorizing the town of Dedham to grant 3 additional licenses for the sale of all alcoholic beverages to be drunk on the premises
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-08-23 | House | Accompanied H3614 |
2013-08-08 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H3614 |
2013-07-09 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/16/2013 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-1 |
2013-06-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-06-17 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
H3614 (Replaced by) 2014-05-15 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 107 of the Acts of 2014
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H3519 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H3519.pdf |