MA H3608 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to supplemental infrastructure financing for transportation. Transportation.
Title
Relative to transportation infrastructure value capture
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-03 | House | No further action taken |
2021-07-28 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2021-07-20 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/22/2021 from 02:00 PM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S2436 (Similar To) 2022-12-22 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S2473 (Similar To) 2022-08-08 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S5 (Similar To) 2021-06-09 - Amendment again agreed to - see Senate Roll Call #48 and House Roll Call #38 (Yeas 159 to Nays 41)
H3951 (Similar To) 2021-07-15 - Text of amendment, see H3903
S1772 (Similar To) 2022-03-31 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4619
H2582 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
S2087 (Similar To) 2022-01-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2144 (Similar To) 2022-08-08 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S287 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
S505 (Similar To) 2022-03-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1073 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
H4867 (Similar To) 2022-06-21 - Rejected
H4897 (Similar To) 2022-06-23 - Published as amended, see H4916
H57 (Similar To) 2021-06-01 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3852
H2912 (Similar To) 2022-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H5200
S2473 (Similar To) 2022-08-08 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S5 (Similar To) 2021-06-09 - Amendment again agreed to - see Senate Roll Call #48 and House Roll Call #38 (Yeas 159 to Nays 41)
H3951 (Similar To) 2021-07-15 - Text of amendment, see H3903
S1772 (Similar To) 2022-03-31 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4619
H2582 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
S2087 (Similar To) 2022-01-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2144 (Similar To) 2022-08-08 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S287 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
S505 (Similar To) 2022-03-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1073 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
H4867 (Similar To) 2022-06-21 - Rejected
H4897 (Similar To) 2022-06-23 - Published as amended, see H4916
H57 (Similar To) 2021-06-01 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3852
H2912 (Similar To) 2022-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H5200
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3608 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3608.pdf |