MA H3681 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4473
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on April 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4473
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4473
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
That the city of Salem be authorized to establish a means-tested senior citizen property tax exemption. Revenue. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Authorizing the city of Salem to establish a means-tested senior citizen property tax exemption
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Tucker [D] | Sen. Joan Lovely [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-27 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4473 |
2019-09-18 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/24/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-2 |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-04-04 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
H2392 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4469
H3857 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4475
H4081 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4477
H4473 (Replaced by) 2020-12-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 228 of the Acts of 2020
H3857 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4475
H4081 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4477
H4473 (Replaced by) 2020-12-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 228 of the Acts of 2020
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3681 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3681.pdf |