MA H3681 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to parking at certain airports for disabled veterans. Veterans and Federal Affairs.
Title
Relative to parking at certain airports for disabled veterans
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-03 | House | No further action taken |
2022-05-17 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading |
2022-03-28 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2021-11-24 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/30/2021 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Veterans and Federal Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
S42 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - New draft substituted (Tarr), see S2978
H2883 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H4010 (Similar To) 2021-09-30 - Chapter 70 of the Acts of 2021
H4051 (Similar To) 2021-08-05 - See H4010
H2203 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H3486 (Similar To) 2022-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4966
H2817 (Similar To) 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5244
H3393 (Similar To) 2022-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4966
H3644 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2288 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S1957 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2743
S2364 (Similar To) 2022-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2642
S1324 (Similar To) 2022-01-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2630
S2434 (Similar To) 2022-06-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2936 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
H2883 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H4010 (Similar To) 2021-09-30 - Chapter 70 of the Acts of 2021
H4051 (Similar To) 2021-08-05 - See H4010
H2203 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H3486 (Similar To) 2022-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4966
H2817 (Similar To) 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5244
H3393 (Similar To) 2022-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4966
H3644 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2288 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S1957 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2743
S2364 (Similar To) 2022-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2642
S1324 (Similar To) 2022-01-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2630
S2434 (Similar To) 2022-06-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2936 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3681 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3681.pdf |