MA H3764 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H3837
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on October 27 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3837
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 27 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3837
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
RELATIVE TO STRENGTHENING OVERSIGHT OF EDUCATION COLLABORATIVES
Title
RELATIVE TO STRENGTHENING OVERSIGHT OF EDUCATION COLLABORATIVES
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-08 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H3837 |
2011-11-03 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/08/2011 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in A-2 |
2011-10-31 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2011-10-27 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Education |
Same As/Similar To
H3837 (Replaced by) 2013-01-01 - No further action taken