MA H380 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to commercial rebate expiration. Housing.
Title
Relative to commercial rebate expiration
Sponsors
Rep. Carl Sciortino [D] | Rep. Ruth Balser [D] | Rep. Carolyn Dykema [D] | Sen. Salvatore DiDomenico [D] |
Rep. Denise Andrews [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2012-06-25 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading |
2012-05-29 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the House committee on Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2012-03-08 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 03/15/2012 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in B-1 |
2011-10-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2011-10-17 | House | Discharged to the Joint Committee on Community Development and Small Businesses |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2011-01-24 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Housing |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H380 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=8241&generalCourtId=1 |