MA H3892 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H3981
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on August 28 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-10-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3981
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on August 28 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-10-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3981
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
That the city of Medford be authorized to issue certain licenses to the Chevalier Theatre for the sale of food and alcoholic beverages. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Authorizing the city of Medford to issue certain licenses to the Chevalier Theatre for the sale of food and alcoholic beverages
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-27 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H3981 |
2017-09-18 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 09/19/2017 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1 |
2017-09-05 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/19/2017 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1 |
2017-08-31 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-08-28 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
H879 (Similar To) 2018-02-20 - Accompanied H3327
H3981 (Replaced by) 2017-10-31 - Amendment #1 (Speliotis) adopted
H3991 (Similar To) 2017-11-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 128 of the Acts of 2017
H4373 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 199 of the Acts of 2018
H4773 (Similar To) 2018-07-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4848
H4923 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H3981 (Replaced by) 2017-10-31 - Amendment #1 (Speliotis) adopted
H3991 (Similar To) 2017-11-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 128 of the Acts of 2017
H4373 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 199 of the Acts of 2018
H4773 (Similar To) 2018-07-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4848
H4923 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H3892 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H3892.pdf |