MA H4773 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4848
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on June 18 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4848
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 18 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4848
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
That the city of Medford be authorized to use inserts to accompany municipal property tax bills in said city. Revenue. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Regarding the use of inserts to accompany municipal property tax bills in the city of Medford
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-30 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4848 |
2018-07-23 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/26/2018 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2 |
2018-07-17 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2018-07-17 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
2018-06-18 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Same As/Similar To
H3892 (Similar To) 2017-10-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3981
H3991 (Similar To) 2017-11-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 128 of the Acts of 2017
H4373 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 199 of the Acts of 2018
H3981 (Similar To) 2017-10-31 - Amendment #1 (Speliotis) adopted
H4848 (Replaced by) 2018-11-02 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 288 of the Acts of 2018
H4923 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H3991 (Similar To) 2017-11-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 128 of the Acts of 2017
H4373 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 199 of the Acts of 2018
H3981 (Similar To) 2017-10-31 - Amendment #1 (Speliotis) adopted
H4848 (Replaced by) 2018-11-02 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 288 of the Acts of 2018
H4923 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4773 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4773.pdf |