MA H3932 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4517
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 30 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4517
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 30 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4517
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to liability for damage caused by dogs. The Judiciary.
Title
Promoting safe dog ownership
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-05 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4517 |
2023-08-30 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/07/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-07-11 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/18/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-06-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-06-15 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
2023-05-30 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Same As/Similar To
S354 (Similar To) 2024-02-08 - Accompanied a study order, see S2614
H3103 (Similar To) 2024-06-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4675
H4310 (Similar To) 2024-02-08 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4423 (Similar To) 2024-02-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4517 (Replaced by) 2024-06-05 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H4782 (Similar To) 2024-07-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
H3103 (Similar To) 2024-06-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4675
H4310 (Similar To) 2024-02-08 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4423 (Similar To) 2024-02-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4517 (Replaced by) 2024-06-05 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H4782 (Similar To) 2024-07-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3932 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3932.pdf |