MA H4423 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H579
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To promote high-quality early literacy instruction and improve student outcomes
Title
To promote high-quality early literacy instruction and improve student outcomes
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-26 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2024-02-26 | House | New draft of H579 |
2024-02-26 | House | Reported from the committee on Education |
Same As/Similar To
H579 (Replaces) 2024-02-26 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4423
S2481 (Similar To) 2023-10-26 - Reprinted, as amended, see S2491
S2473 (Similar To) 2023-10-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H4637 (Similar To) 2024-05-31 - Hearing scheduled for 06/06/2024 from 11:00 AM-02:00 PM in A-1
S2491 (Similar To) 2023-10-30 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2481 (Similar To) 2023-10-26 - Reprinted, as amended, see S2491
S2473 (Similar To) 2023-10-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H4637 (Similar To) 2024-05-31 - Hearing scheduled for 06/06/2024 from 11:00 AM-02:00 PM in A-1
S2491 (Similar To) 2023-10-30 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H4423 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H4423.pdf |