MA H4782 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 20 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-07-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
Pending: House Steering, Policy and Scheduling Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 20 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-07-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
Pending: House Steering, Policy and Scheduling Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the minimum years of service required to be eligible for a civil service promotion to the position of fire lieutenant in the town of Milford. Public Service. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Relative to the minimum years of service required to be eligible for a civil service promotion to the position of fire lieutenant in the town of Milford
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-24 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2024-06-24 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/27/2024 from 09:00 AM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only |
2024-06-24 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-06-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H4782 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H4782.pdf |