MA H3983 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H832
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on July 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To create a 2050 roadmap to a clean and thriving commonwealth
Title
To create a 2050 roadmap to a clean and thriving commonwealth
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-22 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2019-07-22 | House | New draft of H832 |
2019-07-22 | House | Reported from the committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
H832 (Replaces) 2019-07-22 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3983
S493 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2540
H2977 (Similar To) 2020-06-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4772
S520 (Similar To) 2020-04-06 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S435 (Similar To) 2020-01-30 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S493 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2540
H2977 (Similar To) 2020-06-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4772
S520 (Similar To) 2020-04-06 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S435 (Similar To) 2020-01-30 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3983 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3983.pdf |