MA H4041 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on January 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-06 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 273 of the Acts of 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on January 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-06 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 273 of the Acts of 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Representative Tucker of Salem and Senator Lovely, a joint petition of Paul F. Tucker and Joan B. Lovely (with the approval of the mayor and city council) that the scholarship and education committee in the city of Salem be authorized to provide scholarships from funds set aside for educational purposes. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Authorizing the Salem scholarship and education committee to provide scholarships from funds set aside for educational purposes
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Tucker [D] | Sen. Joan Lovely [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-06 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 273 of the Acts of 2020 | |
2020-12-30 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2020-12-29 | House | Enacted |
2020-12-29 | Senate | Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2020-12-29 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2020-07-10 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Read; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2020-02-13 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2019-10-21 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2019-10-21 | House | Rules suspended |
2019-10-21 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2019-10-17 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2019-10-07 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/15/2019 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2019-08-12 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-08-08 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Same As/Similar To
H3749 (Similar To) 2019-10-24 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4144
H4040 (Similar To) 2019-10-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4117
H2791 (Similar To) 2019-09-16 - Accompanied S1881
H3681 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4473
S1881 (Similar To) 2020-03-05 - New draft substituted, see S2584
H4245 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4040 (Similar To) 2019-10-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4117
H2791 (Similar To) 2019-09-16 - Accompanied S1881
H3681 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4473
S1881 (Similar To) 2020-03-05 - New draft substituted, see S2584
H4245 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H4041 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H4041.pdf |