MA H4077 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H1013
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on May 9 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 9 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to liquor licenses (House, No. 4077). May 9, 2012. Theodore C. Speliotis, for the committee.
Title
Relative to Liquor Licenses
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2012-05-16 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2012-05-14 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading |
2012-05-09 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the House committee on Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2012-05-09 | House | New draft of H1013 |
2012-05-09 | House | Reported from the committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
H1013 (Replaces) 2012-05-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4077
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H4077 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=117734&generalCourtId=1 |