MA H4077 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 14 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-16 - Adopted, in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 14 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-16 - Adopted, in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Mr. O'Day of West Boylston, a petition of [PETITIONERS LIST] [BACKING TEXT]. Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently.
Title
Extending until Friday, April 15, 2016 the time within which the committee on Municipalities and Regional Government is authorized to report on current House document 3906
Sponsors
Rep. James O'Day [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-16 | Senate | Adopted, in concurrence |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2016-03-14 | House | Adopted |
2016-03-14 | House | Rules suspended |
2016-03-14 | House | Committee reported ought to be adopted |
2016-03-14 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently |
Same As/Similar To
H110 (Similar To) 2016-07-21 - New draft substituted, see H4534
H2801 (Similar To) 2016-03-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4102
H2028 (Similar To) 2016-03-14 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4068
H3212 (Similar To) 2015-07-23 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H1756 (Similar To) 2015-10-13 - Accompanied S999
H4761 (Similar To) 2017-01-11 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 386 of the Acts of 2016
H2801 (Similar To) 2016-03-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4102
H2028 (Similar To) 2016-03-14 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4068
H3212 (Similar To) 2015-07-23 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H1756 (Similar To) 2015-10-13 - Accompanied S999
H4761 (Similar To) 2017-01-11 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 386 of the Acts of 2016
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H4077 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H4077.pdf |