MA H4079 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 67 of the Acts of 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 67 of the Acts of 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
That the town of Ayer be authorized to establish the position of treasurer-collector in said town. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Establishing the Appointed Position of Treasurer-Collector in the Town of Ayer
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-12 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 67 of the Acts of 2018 | |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2018-04-02 | House | Enacted |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Read and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2018-02-05 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2018-01-18 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2018-01-18 | House | Rules suspended |
2018-01-18 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2018-01-11 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2017-12-18 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-12-14 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Same As/Similar To
H4080 (Similar To) 2018-04-27 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 79 of the Acts of 2018
H4077 (Similar To) 2018-04-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 65 of the Acts of 2018
H4078 (Similar To) 2018-04-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 66 of the Acts of 2018
H4162 (Similar To) 2018-04-19 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 74 of the Acts of 2018
H4875 (Similar To) 2018-09-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4907
H4077 (Similar To) 2018-04-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 65 of the Acts of 2018
H4078 (Similar To) 2018-04-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 66 of the Acts of 2018
H4162 (Similar To) 2018-04-19 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 74 of the Acts of 2018
H4875 (Similar To) 2018-09-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4907
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4079 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4079.pdf |