MA H4232 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on August 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 270 of the Acts of 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on August 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 270 of the Acts of 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to preserving a memorial to landing ship tanks in the town of Hingham. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
Providing for the preservation of a memorial to landing ship tanks in the town of Higham
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-08 | House | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 270 of the Acts of 2014 |
2014-08-01 | Senate | Laid before the Governor |
2014-08-01 | Senate | Enacted - Roll Call #488 [YEAS 39 - NAYS 0] |
2014-08-01 | House | Enacted 153 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 500) |
2014-07-31 | House | House concurred in the Senate amendment |
2014-07-31 | Senate | Read second, amended, ordered to a third reading, read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2014-07-31 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2014-07-31 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass |
2014-07-29 | Senate | Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2014-07-29 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2014-07-29 | House | Rules suspended |
2014-07-28 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2014-07-28 | House | Rules suspended |
2014-07-28 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2014-07-28 | House | Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2014-07-24 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2014-07-18 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/23/2014 from 11:30 AM-02:00 PM in B-2 |
2014-06-26 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2014-06-25 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the House Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
2014-06-18 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H4232 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H4232.pdf |