MA H4378 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 23 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-29 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 23 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-29 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
That the town of Middleton be authorized to establish a reserve fund. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Establishing a certain reserve fund in the town of Middleton
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-29 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2016-06-27 | Senate | Read; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2016-06-23 | House | Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2016-06-20 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2016-06-20 | House | Rules suspended |
2016-06-20 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2016-06-16 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2016-06-14 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/14/2016 from 12:00 PM-02:00 PM in B-2 |
2016-06-09 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2016-06-08 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Same As/Similar To
H1400 (Similar To) 2017-01-03 - No further action
H1401 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H1392 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H1396 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H1397 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H4743 (Similar To) 2017-01-11 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 383 of the Acts of 2016
H4747 (Similar To) 2017-01-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 412 of the Acts of 2016
H4753 (Similar To) 2016-12-22 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4770
H1401 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H1392 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H1396 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H1397 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H4743 (Similar To) 2017-01-11 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 383 of the Acts of 2016
H4747 (Similar To) 2017-01-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 412 of the Acts of 2016
H4753 (Similar To) 2016-12-22 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4770
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H4378 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H4378.pdf |