MA H449 | 2009-2010 | 186th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4560
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-3)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4560
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4560
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing a state university system in the Commonwealth
Title
CONSTITUTING A STATE UNIVERSITY SYSTEM.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-18 | Accompanied a new draft, see H4560 | |
2009-05-18 | Discharged to the committee on Joint Committee on Higher Education | |
2009-05-26 | Senate concurred | |
2009-01-20 | Senate concurred | |
2009-01-20 | Referred to the committee on Joint Committee on Education |
Same As/Similar To
H4560 (Replaced by) 2010-07-08 - New draft substituted, see H4864
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/186/House/H449 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=885&generalCourtId=2 |