MA H4560 | 2009-2010 | 186th General Court
Note: For complete list of accompanied drafts and orders please see the SAST list.
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-07-08 - New draft substituted, see H4864
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-07-08 - New draft substituted, see H4864
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Changing the name state college to state university
Title
Relative to changing the name state college to state university.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-08 | New draft substituted, see H4864 | |
2010-07-08 | Read second | |
2010-07-08 | Rules suspended | |
2010-07-08 | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting with the amendment pending | |
2010-07-08 | Referred to the committee on House Committee On Steering, Policy and Scheduling with the amendment pending | |
2010-07-08 | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting therefore a new draft, see H4864 | |
2010-03-18 | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Committee On Ways and Means | |
2010-03-18 | New draft of S2162, H449 and H1109 | |
2010-03-18 | Reported from the committee on Joint Committee on Higher Education | |
2010-03-11 | Reported from the committee on Higher Education |
Same As/Similar To
S2162 (Replaces) 2010-03-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4560
H449 (Replaces) 2010-03-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4560
H1109 (Replaces) 2010-03-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4560
H4864 (Replaced by) 2010-07-28 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 189 of the Acts of 2010
H449 (Replaces) 2010-03-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4560
H1109 (Replaces) 2010-03-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4560
H4864 (Replaced by) 2010-07-28 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 189 of the Acts of 2010
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/186/House/H4560 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=8381&generalCourtId=2 |