MA H4571 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: For complete list of accompanied drafts and orders please see the SAST list.
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on June 6 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-06 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 6 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-06 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to authorizing the committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture to make an investigation and study of certain House documents concerning oceans and waterways
Title
Oceans and waterways
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-06 | House | Discharged to the committee on House Rules |
2019-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2018-06-06 | House | Order reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Joint Rules |
2018-06-06 | House | Accompanied by H396, H401, H403, H405, H406, H410, H411, H455, H468 and H471 |
2018-06-06 | House | Reported from the committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
H396 (Replaces) 2018-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H4571
H401 (Replaces) 2018-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H4571
H403 (Replaces) 2018-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H4571
H405 (Replaces) 2018-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H4571
H406 (Replaces) 2018-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H4571
H410 (Replaces) 2018-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H4571
H411 (Replaces) 2018-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H4571
H455 (Replaces) 2018-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H4571
H468 (Replaces) 2018-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H4571
H471 (Replaces) 2018-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H4571
S2489 (Similar To) 2018-05-14 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H4537 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H4502 (Similar To) 2018-05-17 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H4557 (Similar To) 2018-06-04 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H4244 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4591 (Similar To) 2018-06-11 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H4590 (Similar To) 2018-06-11 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H4610 (Similar To) 2018-06-14 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H4625 (Similar To) 2018-06-18 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H4632 (Similar To) 2018-06-19 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H4641 (Similar To) 2018-06-20 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H4672 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4685 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H4678 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H4706 (Similar To) 2018-07-09 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H4740 (Similar To) 2018-07-12 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H4861 (Similar To) 2018-07-31 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H401 (Replaces) 2018-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H4571
H403 (Replaces) 2018-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H4571
H405 (Replaces) 2018-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H4571
H406 (Replaces) 2018-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H4571
H410 (Replaces) 2018-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H4571
H411 (Replaces) 2018-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H4571
H455 (Replaces) 2018-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H4571
H468 (Replaces) 2018-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H4571
H471 (Replaces) 2018-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H4571
S2489 (Similar To) 2018-05-14 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H4537 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H4502 (Similar To) 2018-05-17 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H4557 (Similar To) 2018-06-04 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H4244 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4591 (Similar To) 2018-06-11 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H4590 (Similar To) 2018-06-11 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H4610 (Similar To) 2018-06-14 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H4625 (Similar To) 2018-06-18 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H4632 (Similar To) 2018-06-19 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H4641 (Similar To) 2018-06-20 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H4672 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4685 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H4678 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H4706 (Similar To) 2018-07-09 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H4740 (Similar To) 2018-07-12 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H4861 (Similar To) 2018-07-31 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4571 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4571.pdf |