MA H4712 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H1101
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on July 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-09 - See H1101
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-09 - See H1101
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the membership of the Millbury Redevelopment Authority
Title
Relative to the membership of the Millbury Redevelopment Authority
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-09 | House | See H1101 |
Same As/Similar To
H1101 (Replaced by) 2019-01-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 378 of the Acts of 2018
H1782 (Similar To) 2018-01-24 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H1003 (Similar To) 2018-03-05 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H1712 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H2003 (Similar To) 2018-02-05 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4170
H1782 (Similar To) 2018-01-24 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H1003 (Similar To) 2018-03-05 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H1712 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H2003 (Similar To) 2018-02-05 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4170
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4712 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4712.pdf |