MA H4794 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H4188
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-08-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 163 of the Acts of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-08-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 163 of the Acts of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the town of Pepperell to convey a certain parcel of land to the Commonwealth
Title
Authorizing the town of Pepperell to convey a certain parcel of land to the Commonwealth
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-07-30 - Senate - Senate Enacted Roll Call #236 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-09 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 163 of the Acts of 2022 | |
2022-08-09 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 163 of the Acts of 2022 | |
2022-07-30 | Senate | Laid before the Governor |
2022-07-30 | Senate | Enacted -see Roll Call #236 (Yeas 39 to Nays 0) |
2022-07-30 | House | Enacted - 153 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY No. 257 ) |
2022-07-30 | Senate | Emergency preamble adopted |
2022-07-30 | House | Emergency preamble adopted |
2022-07-30 | House | House concurred in the Senate amendment |
2022-07-30 | House | Rules suspended |
2022-07-29 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Bills in the Third Reading |
2022-07-29 | Senate | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2022-07-29 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2022-07-29 | Senate | Amended by striking out all after the enacting clause and inserting in place thereof the text of S3076 |
2022-07-29 | Senate | Read second |
2022-07-29 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2022-07-29 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, inserting in place thereof the text of S3076 |
2022-05-19 | Senate | Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2022-05-18 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2022-05-18 | House | Rules suspended |
2022-05-17 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2022-05-17 | House | New draft of H4188 |
2022-05-17 | House | Pending new draft of H4188 |
2022-05-17 | House | Reported from the committee on House Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
H4188 (Replaces) 2022-05-17 - New draft substituted, see H4794
S1358 (Similar To) 2021-07-29 - New draft substituted, see S2503
S1366 (Similar To) 2021-07-15 - Accompanied H3867
H3188 (Similar To) 2021-07-26 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3994
H3217 (Similar To) 2022-06-21 - New draft substituted, see H4901
H4899 (Similar To) 2022-11-18 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 275 of the Acts of 2022
H4900 (Similar To) 2022-08-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 160 of the Acts of 2022
H4901 (Similar To) 2022-08-02 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 130 of the Acts of 2022
H4902 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - Governor's amendment adopted
H3163 (Similar To) 2021-09-27 - New draft substituted, see H4126
H2189 (Similar To) 2021-10-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 57 of the Acts of 2021
S1358 (Similar To) 2021-07-29 - New draft substituted, see S2503
S1366 (Similar To) 2021-07-15 - Accompanied H3867
H3188 (Similar To) 2021-07-26 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3994
H3217 (Similar To) 2022-06-21 - New draft substituted, see H4901
H4899 (Similar To) 2022-11-18 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 275 of the Acts of 2022
H4900 (Similar To) 2022-08-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 160 of the Acts of 2022
H4901 (Similar To) 2022-08-02 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 130 of the Acts of 2022
H4902 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - Governor's amendment adopted
H3163 (Similar To) 2021-09-27 - New draft substituted, see H4126
H2189 (Similar To) 2021-10-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 57 of the Acts of 2021
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H4794 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H4794.pdf |
Roll Call | https://malegislature.gov/RollCall/192/SenateRollCall236.pdf |