MA H4867 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H4176
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on August 8 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-08-12 - Read; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on August 8 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-08-12 - Read; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the town of Holliston to grant an additional license for the sale of all alcoholic beverages
Title
Authorizing the town of Holliston to grant an additional license for the sale of all alcoholic beverages
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-08-12 | Senate | Read; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2024-08-08 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2024-07-24 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2024-07-24 | House | Rules suspended |
2024-07-24 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2024-07-15 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2024-07-15 | House | New draft of H4176 |
2024-07-15 | House | Reported from the committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
H4176 (Replaces) 2024-07-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4867
S2714 (Similar To) 2024-04-25 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H4893 (Similar To) 2024-08-12 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4992
H4992 (Similar To) 2024-09-30 - Read third and passed to be engrossed
H4990 (Similar To) 2024-09-09 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S2714 (Similar To) 2024-04-25 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H4893 (Similar To) 2024-08-12 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4992
H4992 (Similar To) 2024-09-30 - Read third and passed to be engrossed
H4990 (Similar To) 2024-09-09 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H4867 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H4867.pdf |