MA H4940 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4983
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on July 30 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-21 - New draft substituted, see H4983
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 30 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-21 - New draft substituted, see H4983
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to an agricultural deed restriction in the town of Westborough. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.
Title
Relative to an agricultural deed restriction in the town of Westborough
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-21 | House | New draft substituted, see H4983 |
2020-09-21 | House | Read second, amended (as recommended by the committee on House Ways and Means) |
2020-09-21 | House | Rules suspended |
2020-09-21 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading with the amendment pending |
2020-09-21 | House | Referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling with the amendment pending |
2020-09-21 | House | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting therefor a bill with the same title, see H4983 |
2020-08-20 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2020-08-06 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-08-03 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
2020-07-30 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Same As/Similar To
H4983 (Replaced by) 2020-12-23 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 259 of the Acts of 2020
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H4940 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H4940.pdf |