MA H4983 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H4940
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum:
Status: Passed on December 23 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-23 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 259 of the Acts of 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum:
Status: Passed on December 23 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-23 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 259 of the Acts of 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to an agricultural deed restriction in the town of Westborough
Title
Relative to an agricultural deed restriction in the town of Westborough
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-23 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 259 of the Acts of 2020 | |
2020-12-18 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2020-12-16 | House | Enacted |
2020-12-16 | Senate | Emergency preamble adopted |
2020-12-14 | House | Emergency preamble adopted |
2020-12-10 | Senate | Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed |
2020-12-10 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2020-12-10 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass |
2020-10-01 | Senate | Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2020-09-24 | House | Read third, amended and passed to be engrossed |
2020-09-24 | House | Reported from the committee on House Bills in the Third Reading |
2020-09-21 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2020-09-21 | House | New draft of H4940 |
2020-09-21 | House | Pending new draft of H4940 |
2020-09-21 | House | Reported from the committee on House Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
H4940 (Replaces) 2020-09-21 - New draft substituted, see H4983
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H4983 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H4983.pdf |