MA H4952 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 384 of the Acts of 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 384 of the Acts of 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
That the town of Berlin be authorized to establish a board of selectmen-town administrator form of government in said town. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Establishing a Board of Selectmen-Town Administrator form of government for the town of Berlin
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-07 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 384 of the Acts of 2018 | |
2018-12-31 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2018-12-31 | House | Enacted |
2018-12-31 | Senate | Read, rules suspended, read second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed |
2018-12-21 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2018-11-19 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2018-11-19 | House | Rules suspended |
2018-11-19 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2018-11-15 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2018-11-05 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2018-11-01 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Same As/Similar To
H1409 (Similar To) 2017-05-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 16 of the Acts of 2017
H3513 (Similar To) 2018-01-25 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H3772 (Similar To) 2017-11-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 126 of the Acts of 2017
H3961 (Similar To) 2017-12-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 158 of the Acts of 2017
H4690 (Similar To) 2018-10-11 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 269 of the Acts of 2018
H5003 (Similar To) 2019-01-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 416 of the Acts of 2018
H3513 (Similar To) 2018-01-25 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H3772 (Similar To) 2017-11-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 126 of the Acts of 2017
H3961 (Similar To) 2017-12-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 158 of the Acts of 2017
H4690 (Similar To) 2018-10-11 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 269 of the Acts of 2018
H5003 (Similar To) 2019-01-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 416 of the Acts of 2018
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4952 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4952.pdf |