MA H3772 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-11-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 126 of the Acts of 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-11-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 126 of the Acts of 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the authority of the town administrator in the town of Harvard. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Relative to the authority of the town administrator of the town of Harvard
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-21 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 126 of the Acts of 2017 | |
2017-11-15 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2017-11-15 | House | Enacted |
2017-11-15 | Senate | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2017-11-15 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2017-10-04 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2017-09-07 | Senate | Read; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2017-09-05 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2017-07-26 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2017-07-26 | House | Rules suspended |
2017-07-26 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2017-07-26 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2017-07-18 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/25/2017 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1 |
2017-06-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-06-21 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Same As/Similar To
H1409 (Similar To) 2017-05-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 16 of the Acts of 2017
H3771 (Similar To) 2018-07-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4729
H3513 (Similar To) 2018-01-25 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H3773 (Similar To) 2017-11-08 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H4947 (Similar To) 2019-01-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 387 of the Acts of 2018
H4952 (Similar To) 2019-01-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 384 of the Acts of 2018
H3771 (Similar To) 2018-07-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4729
H3513 (Similar To) 2018-01-25 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H3773 (Similar To) 2017-11-08 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H4947 (Similar To) 2019-01-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 387 of the Acts of 2018
H4952 (Similar To) 2019-01-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 384 of the Acts of 2018
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H3772 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H3772.pdf |