MA H3773 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on October 30 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-11-08 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on October 30 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-11-08 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
That the town of Harvard be authorized to pay certain bills from prior fiscal years. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Relative to the payment of bills of prior fiscal years by the town of Harvard
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-08 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2017-10-31 | Senate | Read; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2017-10-30 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2017-09-21 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2017-09-21 | House | Rules suspended |
2017-09-21 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2017-09-13 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2017-07-18 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/25/2017 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1 |
2017-06-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-06-21 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Same As/Similar To
H3771 (Similar To) 2018-07-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4729
H3772 (Similar To) 2017-11-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 126 of the Acts of 2017
H4947 (Similar To) 2019-01-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 387 of the Acts of 2018
H4949 (Similar To) 2018-11-29 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4984
H4984 (Similar To) 2019-01-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 412 of the Acts of 2018
H3772 (Similar To) 2017-11-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 126 of the Acts of 2017
H4947 (Similar To) 2019-01-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 387 of the Acts of 2018
H4949 (Similar To) 2018-11-29 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4984
H4984 (Similar To) 2019-01-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 412 of the Acts of 2018
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H3773 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H3773.pdf |