MA H4961 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H2090
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on June 30 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 30 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing a special commission to study and report on the history of state institutions for people with developmental and mental health disabilities in the Commonwealth
Title
Establishing a special commission to study and report on the history of state institutions for people with developmental and mental health disabilities in the Commonwealth
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-03 | House | No further action taken |
2022-07-11 | House | Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
2022-06-30 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently |
2022-06-30 | House | New draft of H2090 |
2022-06-30 | House | Reported from the committee on Mental Health, Substance Use and Recovery |
Same As/Similar To
H2090 (Replaces) 2022-06-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4961
S1736 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S1612 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2044 (Similar To) 2022-01-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2620
S361 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
S2393 (Similar To) 2022-07-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H609 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1347 (Similar To) 2022-07-11 - Resolve reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1383 (Similar To) 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
S1736 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S1612 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2044 (Similar To) 2022-01-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2620
S361 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
S2393 (Similar To) 2022-07-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H609 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1347 (Similar To) 2022-07-11 - Resolve reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1383 (Similar To) 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H4961 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H4961.pdf |