MA H5017 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H4862
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on September 26 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 222 of the Acts of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on September 26 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 222 of the Acts of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the Devens Enterprise Commission to grant a license for the sale of wines and malt beverages not to be drunk on the premises
Title
Authorizing the Devens Enterprise Commission to grant a license for the sale of wines and malt beverages not to be drunk on the premises
Sponsors
House Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure | Rep. Danillo Sena [D] | Sen. James Eldridge [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-26 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 222 of the Acts of 2022 | |
2022-09-19 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2022-09-19 | House | Enacted |
2022-09-15 | Senate | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2022-09-15 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2022-08-22 | Senate | Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading |
2022-08-18 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2022-07-20 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2022-07-20 | House | Rules suspended |
2022-07-20 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2022-07-12 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2022-07-12 | House | New draft of H4862 |
2022-07-12 | House | Reported from the committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
H4862 (Replaces) 2022-07-12 - Accompanied a new draft, see H5017
S199 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2666
H380 (Similar To) 2021-05-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3811
H3831 (Similar To) 2021-11-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4240
H383 (Similar To) 2021-05-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3812
H3715 (Similar To) 2021-05-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3813
S199 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2666
H380 (Similar To) 2021-05-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3811
H3831 (Similar To) 2021-11-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4240
H383 (Similar To) 2021-05-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3812
H3715 (Similar To) 2021-05-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3813
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H5017 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H5017.pdf |