MA H4862 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5017
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on May 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-07-12 - Accompanied a new draft, see H5017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-07-12 - Accompanied a new draft, see H5017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to authorize the Devens Enterprise Commission to grant a license for the sale of wines and malt beverages not to be drunk on the premises. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.
Title
Authorizing the Devens Enterprise Commission to grant a license for the sale of wines and malt beverages not to be drunk on the premises
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-12 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H5017 |
2022-06-13 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/20/2022 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only |
2022-06-09 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-06-08 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
2022-05-12 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Same As/Similar To
S199 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2666
H380 (Similar To) 2021-05-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3811
H3831 (Similar To) 2021-11-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4240
H383 (Similar To) 2021-05-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3812
H3715 (Similar To) 2021-05-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3813
H5017 (Replaced by) 2022-09-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 222 of the Acts of 2022
H380 (Similar To) 2021-05-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3811
H3831 (Similar To) 2021-11-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4240
H383 (Similar To) 2021-05-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3812
H3715 (Similar To) 2021-05-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3813
H5017 (Replaced by) 2022-09-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 222 of the Acts of 2022
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H4862 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H4862.pdf |