MA H5090 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4954
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 39-1)
Status: Passed on July 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 127 of the Acts of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 39-1)
Status: Passed on July 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 127 of the Acts of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
The committee of conference on the disagreeing votes of the two branches with reference to the Senate amendment of the House Bill expanding protections for reproductive rights (House, No. 4954), reports recommending passage of the accompanying bill (House, No. 5090).
Title
Expanding protections for reproductive and gender-affirming care
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-07-26 - Senate - Senate conference committee report Roll Call #217 (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-29 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 127 of the Acts of 2022 | |
2022-07-26 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2022-07-26 | House | Enacted - 137 YEAS to 16 NAYS (See YEA and NAY No. 236 ) |
2022-07-26 | Senate | Emergency preamble adopted |
2022-07-26 | House | Emergency preamble adopted |
2022-07-26 | Senate | Committee of conference report accepted, in concurrence -see Roll Call #217 (Yeas 39 to Nays 1) |
2022-07-26 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2022-07-26 | House | Committee of conference report accepted - 137 YEAS to 16 NAYS (See YEA and NAY No. 232 ) |
2022-07-26 | House | Rules suspended |
2022-07-25 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting, the question being on acceptance |
2022-07-25 | House | Referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2022-07-25 | House | Reported on H4954 |
2022-07-25 | House | Reported from the committee of conference |
Same As/Similar To
H4954 (Replaced by) 2022-07-25 - Reported by H5090
H2264 (Similar To) 2022-06-28 - New draft substituted, see H4930
H4930 (Similar To) 2022-06-29 - Published as amended, see H4954
S192 (Similar To) 2021-11-04 - Accompanied S211
S765 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2917
S3097 (Similar To) 2022-08-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 177 of the Acts of 2022
S1372 (Similar To) 2021-12-02 - Accompanied H2264
H2264 (Similar To) 2022-06-28 - New draft substituted, see H4930
H4930 (Similar To) 2022-06-29 - Published as amended, see H4954
S192 (Similar To) 2021-11-04 - Accompanied S211
S765 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2917
S3097 (Similar To) 2022-08-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 177 of the Acts of 2022
S1372 (Similar To) 2021-12-02 - Accompanied H2264
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H5090 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H5090.pdf |
Roll Call | https://malegislature.gov/RollCall/192/SenateRollCall217.pdf |