MA H2264 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4930
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 39-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-28 - New draft substituted, see H4930
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-28 - New draft substituted, see H4930
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to further regulate access to emergency contraception. Public Health.
Title
To improve access to emergency contraception
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-28 | House | New draft substituted, see H4930 |
2022-06-28 | House | Read second, amended (as recommended by the committee on House Ways and Means) |
2022-06-28 | House | Rules suspended |
2022-06-28 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading with the amendment pending |
2022-06-28 | House | Referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling with the amendment pending |
2022-06-28 | House | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting therefor a bill, see H4930 |
2022-05-02 | House | Committee recommended bill ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2021-12-02 | House | Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
2021-12-02 | House | Accompanied by S1372 |
2021-05-21 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/07/2021 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
S1372 (Similar To) 2021-12-02 - Accompanied H2264
S192 (Similar To) 2021-11-04 - Accompanied S211
S765 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2917
S879 (Similar To) 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
S2519 (Similar To) 2021-09-02 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4120 (Similar To) 2022-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5219
H1749 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
S806 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2917
S357 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2749
S2315 (Similar To) 2022-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2642
S823 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2714
S760 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2917
S1571 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S775 (Similar To) 2022-03-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2800
S1304 (Similar To) 2022-09-08 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S1346 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2146 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2715
S2584 (Similar To) 2022-08-01 - Reported by S3097
H4930 (Replaced by) 2022-06-29 - Published as amended, see H4954
H4954 (Similar To) 2022-07-25 - Reported by H5090
H5090 (Similar To) 2022-07-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 127 of the Acts of 2022
S192 (Similar To) 2021-11-04 - Accompanied S211
S765 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2917
S879 (Similar To) 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
S2519 (Similar To) 2021-09-02 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4120 (Similar To) 2022-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5219
H1749 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
S806 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2917
S357 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2749
S2315 (Similar To) 2022-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2642
S823 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2714
S760 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2917
S1571 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S775 (Similar To) 2022-03-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2800
S1304 (Similar To) 2022-09-08 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S1346 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2146 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2715
S2584 (Similar To) 2022-08-01 - Reported by S3097
H4930 (Replaced by) 2022-06-29 - Published as amended, see H4954
H4954 (Similar To) 2022-07-25 - Reported by H5090
H5090 (Similar To) 2022-07-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 127 of the Acts of 2022
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H2264 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H2264.pdf |