MA H5381 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H851
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 60-3)
Status: Passed on November 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-11-17 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 274 of the Acts of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 60-3)
Status: Passed on November 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-11-17 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 274 of the Acts of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
The committee of conference on the disagreeing votes of the two branches with reference to the Senate amendment of the House Bill preserving open space in the Commonwealth (House, No. 851), reports, in part, recommending passage of the accompanying bill (House, No. 5381).
Title
Preserving open space in the Commonwealth
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-11-17 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 274 of the Acts of 2022 | |
2022-11-10 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2022-11-10 | House | Enacted |
2022-11-10 | Senate | Committee of conference report accepted, in concurrence |
2022-11-10 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2022-11-10 | House | Committee of conference report accepted |
2022-11-10 | House | Rules suspended |
2022-11-10 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting, the question being on acceptance |
2022-11-10 | House | Referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2022-11-10 | House | Reported on H851 |
2022-11-10 | House | Reported from the committee of conference |
Same As/Similar To
H851 (Replaced by) 2022-11-10 - Reported by H5381
S524 (Similar To) 2021-06-09 - Accompanied H851
S876 (Similar To) 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
S968 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S148 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H3699 (Similar To) 2022-08-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H5070
S1976 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2743
S524 (Similar To) 2021-06-09 - Accompanied H851
S876 (Similar To) 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
S968 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S148 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H3699 (Similar To) 2022-08-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H5070
S1976 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2743
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H5381 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H5381.pdf |