MA H568 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5074
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-1)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H5074
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H5074
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to place a moratorium on certain elementary and secondary education testing during the COVID-19 state of emergency. Education.
Title
To place a moratorium on high stakes testing for the duration of the COVID-19 state of emergency
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-25 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5074 |
2021-09-13 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/20/2021 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Education |
Same As/Similar To
H3702 (Similar To) 2021-05-28 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 16 of the Acts of 2021
S2472 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H3771 (Similar To) 2021-05-18 - Text of amendment, see H3702
H3872 (Similar To) 2021-06-15 - Published as amended, see H3874
H3874 (Similar To) 2021-06-15 - See S2472
S2516 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
H4121 (Similar To) 2021-09-23 - Adopted - 131 YEAS to 28 NAYS (See YEA and NAY No. 103 )
S2401 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2680
S1897 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5250
S1450 (Similar To) 2022-05-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2887
H139 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5040
S2289 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4459
S1194 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2691
H494 (Similar To) 2022-07-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4968
H488 (Similar To) 2022-07-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4968
S250 (Similar To) 2022-09-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4938
S45 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2683
H4234 (Similar To) 2021-12-02 - Reported by H4269
S1454 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2692
S874 (Similar To) 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5266
S2246 (Similar To) 2022-02-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2268 (Similar To) 2022-02-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1193 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2691
H4461 (Similar To) 2022-02-16 - Published as amended, see H4470
H4470 (Similar To) 2022-05-19 - Reported by H4805
S2985 (Similar To) 2022-07-19 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 107 of the Acts of 2022
S2982 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Reprinted, as amended, see S2985
H5055 (Similar To) 2022-08-08 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H5074 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S297 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
S1621 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2472 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H3771 (Similar To) 2021-05-18 - Text of amendment, see H3702
H3872 (Similar To) 2021-06-15 - Published as amended, see H3874
H3874 (Similar To) 2021-06-15 - See S2472
S2516 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
H4121 (Similar To) 2021-09-23 - Adopted - 131 YEAS to 28 NAYS (See YEA and NAY No. 103 )
S2401 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2680
S1897 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5250
S1450 (Similar To) 2022-05-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2887
H139 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5040
S2289 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4459
S1194 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2691
H494 (Similar To) 2022-07-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4968
H488 (Similar To) 2022-07-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4968
S250 (Similar To) 2022-09-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4938
S45 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2683
H4234 (Similar To) 2021-12-02 - Reported by H4269
S1454 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2692
S874 (Similar To) 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5266
S2246 (Similar To) 2022-02-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2268 (Similar To) 2022-02-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1193 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2691
H4461 (Similar To) 2022-02-16 - Published as amended, see H4470
H4470 (Similar To) 2022-05-19 - Reported by H4805
S2985 (Similar To) 2022-07-19 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 107 of the Acts of 2022
S2982 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Reprinted, as amended, see S2985
H5055 (Similar To) 2022-08-08 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H5074 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S297 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
S1621 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H568 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H568.pdf |