MA H574 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5159
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the education standards set by the Board of Elementary and Secondary Education. Education.
Title
Relative to education standards
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-03 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5159 |
2019-06-28 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/09/2019 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Education |
Same As/Similar To
H1827 (Similar To) 2020-01-13 - Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading
H476 (Similar To) 2019-09-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2348
H510 (Similar To) 2019-09-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2348
S238 (Similar To) 2019-09-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2348
S731 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S1859 (Similar To) 2019-07-25 - Accompanied H525
S218 (Similar To) 2020-08-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2886
S1724 (Similar To) 2020-10-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H5040
S2183 (Similar To) 2019-09-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4075
S759 (Similar To) 2020-06-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2736
H3911 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
S2324 (Similar To) 2020-03-05 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2581
S2399 (Similar To) 2020-01-16 - New draft substituted, see S2459
S2412 (Similar To) 2019-11-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 132 of the Acts of 2019
H4275 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
H5159 (Replaced by) 2020-12-03 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H476 (Similar To) 2019-09-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2348
H510 (Similar To) 2019-09-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2348
S238 (Similar To) 2019-09-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2348
S731 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S1859 (Similar To) 2019-07-25 - Accompanied H525
S218 (Similar To) 2020-08-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2886
S1724 (Similar To) 2020-10-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H5040
S2183 (Similar To) 2019-09-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4075
S759 (Similar To) 2020-06-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2736
H3911 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
S2324 (Similar To) 2020-03-05 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2581
S2399 (Similar To) 2020-01-16 - New draft substituted, see S2459
S2412 (Similar To) 2019-11-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 132 of the Acts of 2019
H4275 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
H5159 (Replaced by) 2020-12-03 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H574 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H574.pdf |