MA H575 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4540
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-31 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4540
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-31 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4540
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to establishing mandatory lockdown drills in public and private elementary and secondary schools. Education.
Title
Establishing mandatory school lockdown drills in the Commonwealth
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-31 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4540 |
2021-06-07 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/11/2021 from 10:00 AM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Education |
Same As/Similar To
S2493 (Similar To) 2021-07-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2516 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
H4110 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S329 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
S1464 (Similar To) 2022-03-24 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2781
S383 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
H538 (Similar To) 2021-07-21 - Accompanied H653
S353 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2755
S217 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2666
S371 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2755
S332 (Similar To) 2021-07-21 - Accompanied H653
S315 (Similar To) 2022-05-05 - Accompanied H665
S99 (Similar To) 2022-01-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2624
S322 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
S323 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
H4540 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S356 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2755
H619 (Similar To) 2022-09-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5143
S2516 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
H4110 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S329 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
S1464 (Similar To) 2022-03-24 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2781
S383 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
H538 (Similar To) 2021-07-21 - Accompanied H653
S353 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2755
S217 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2666
S371 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2755
S332 (Similar To) 2021-07-21 - Accompanied H653
S315 (Similar To) 2022-05-05 - Accompanied H665
S99 (Similar To) 2022-01-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2624
S322 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
S323 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
H4540 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S356 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2755
H619 (Similar To) 2022-09-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5143
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H575 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H575.pdf |