MA H712 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4439
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-09-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H4439
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-09-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H4439
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to protecting the rights of custodial and other non teaching employees of school districts. Public Service.
Title
Relative to protecting the rights of custodial and other non teaching employees of school districts.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-09-13 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4439 |
2011-09-12 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/04/2011 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1 |
2011-06-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2011-06-20 | House | Discharged to the Joint Committee on Education |
2011-05-19 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2011-04-21 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/03/2011 from 01:10 PM-04:40 PM in B-1 |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2011-01-24 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
H4439 (Replaced by) 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H712 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=9539&generalCourtId=1 |