MA H734 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5029
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-07-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H5029
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-07-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H5029
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to food assistance for senior citizens. Elder Affairs.
Title
Relative to food assistance for senior citizens
Sponsors
Rep. Linda Campbell [D] | Rep. Jessica Giannino [D] | Rep. James Murphy [D] | Rep. Lindsay Sabadosa [D] |
Rep. Joseph McGonagle [D] | Rep. Brian Murray [D] | Rep. Andres Vargas [D] | Rep. Elizabeth Malia [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-20 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5029 |
2021-07-06 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/12/2021 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Elder Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
H3766 (Similar To) 2022-07-06 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 100 of the Acts of 2022
H3734 (Similar To) 2022-07-12 - Amendment #1 (Garlick) adopted
H732 (Similar To) 2022-10-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H5201
H2905 (Similar To) 2022-04-14 - Accompanied H2915
H4107 (Similar To) 2022-04-28 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S1916 (Similar To) 2022-04-14 - Accompanied H2915
H2915 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1958 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2743
S1961 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2743
S1823 (Similar To) 2022-10-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H5352
S146 (Similar To) 2022-01-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H5029 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1974 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2743
H3734 (Similar To) 2022-07-12 - Amendment #1 (Garlick) adopted
H732 (Similar To) 2022-10-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H5201
H2905 (Similar To) 2022-04-14 - Accompanied H2915
H4107 (Similar To) 2022-04-28 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S1916 (Similar To) 2022-04-14 - Accompanied H2915
H2915 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1958 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2743
S1961 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2743
S1823 (Similar To) 2022-10-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H5352
S146 (Similar To) 2022-01-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H5029 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1974 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2743
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H734 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H734.pdf |