MA H950 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5041
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5041
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5041
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to protect open space, historical resources, and community housing from coastal threats. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.
Title
To protect open space, historical resources, and community housing from coastal threats
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-29 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5041 |
2021-09-14 | Joint | Location Changed - Hearing scheduled for 09/22/2021 from 02:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-09-14 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/22/2021 from 02:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
S876 (Similar To) 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
S524 (Similar To) 2021-06-09 - Accompanied H851
H2951 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
H402 (Similar To) 2022-06-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4880
S29 (Similar To) 2022-02-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 18 of the Acts of 2022
H5041 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H851 (Similar To) 2022-11-10 - Reported by H5381
S524 (Similar To) 2021-06-09 - Accompanied H851
H2951 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
H402 (Similar To) 2022-06-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4880
S29 (Similar To) 2022-02-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 18 of the Acts of 2022
H5041 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H851 (Similar To) 2022-11-10 - Reported by H5381
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H950 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H950.pdf |