MA S29 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H3944
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on February 3 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 18 of the Acts of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on February 3 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 18 of the Acts of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to authorize the city of New Bedford to convey certain land acquired for open space and play ground purposes. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local approval received]
Title
Authorizing the city of New Bedford to convey certain land acquired for open space and play ground purposes
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-01-26 - Senate - Senate Enacted Roll Call #118 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-19 - House - House Enacted - 159 YEAS to 0 NAYS (Y: 159 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-19 - House - House Enacted - 159 YEAS to 0 NAYS (Y: 159 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-03 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 18 of the Acts of 2022 | |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Laid before the Governor |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Enacted -see Roll Call #118 (Yeas 39 to Nays 0) |
2022-01-19 | House | Enacted - 159 YEAS to 0 NAYS ( See YEA and NAY No. 123 ) |
2022-01-03 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2021-11-02 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2021-11-02 | House | Rules suspended |
2021-11-02 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2021-10-12 | House | Read; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2021-10-07 | Senate | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2021-10-07 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2021-10-06 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2021-07-19 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2021-07-19 | Senate | Accompanied by H3944 |
2021-06-15 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/22/2021 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-10 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Same As/Similar To
H3768 (Similar To) 2021-07-26 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H3996
H3751 (Similar To) 2022-07-28 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 119 of the Acts of 2022
H3870 (Similar To) 2021-09-23 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4125
S2456 (Similar To) 2021-07-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3972 (Similar To) 2021-09-14 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 49 of the Acts of 2021
H3944 (Replaces) 2021-07-19 - Accompanied S29
H3996 (Similar To) 2022-02-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 19 of the Acts of 2022
S2503 (Similar To) 2022-11-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 260 of the Acts of 2022
H4098 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2517 (Similar To) 2022-07-21 - New draft substituted (Pacheco), see S3029
H4104 (Similar To) 2022-01-26 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, see H4360
H3346 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S524 (Similar To) 2021-06-09 - Accompanied H851
S1357 (Similar To) 2022-05-16 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 58 of the Acts of 2022
S574 (Similar To) 2022-05-16 - Accompanied H929
S1359 (Similar To) 2022-01-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2630
H3196 (Similar To) 2022-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H5256
H2944 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
S1060 (Similar To) 2022-04-19 - Accompanied a study order, see S2838
S2115 (Similar To) 2021-07-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S154 (Similar To) 2022-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see S2709
H3178 (Similar To) 2021-11-23 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 94 of the Acts of 2021
S876 (Similar To) 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
S2174 (Similar To) 2022-08-08 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H4252 (Similar To) 2022-01-20 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 5 of the Acts of 2022
H4360 (Similar To) 2022-08-02 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 93 of the Acts of 2022
S3091 (Similar To) 2022-08-11 - Message read and placed on file
S3083 (Similar To) 2022-07-31 - New draft (Cyr) substituted, see S3091
S3067 (Similar To) 2022-07-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see S3083
H3751 (Similar To) 2022-07-28 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 119 of the Acts of 2022
H3870 (Similar To) 2021-09-23 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4125
S2456 (Similar To) 2021-07-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3972 (Similar To) 2021-09-14 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 49 of the Acts of 2021
H3944 (Replaces) 2021-07-19 - Accompanied S29
H3996 (Similar To) 2022-02-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 19 of the Acts of 2022
S2503 (Similar To) 2022-11-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 260 of the Acts of 2022
H4098 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2517 (Similar To) 2022-07-21 - New draft substituted (Pacheco), see S3029
H4104 (Similar To) 2022-01-26 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, see H4360
H3346 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S524 (Similar To) 2021-06-09 - Accompanied H851
S1357 (Similar To) 2022-05-16 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 58 of the Acts of 2022
S574 (Similar To) 2022-05-16 - Accompanied H929
S1359 (Similar To) 2022-01-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2630
H3196 (Similar To) 2022-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H5256
H2944 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
S1060 (Similar To) 2022-04-19 - Accompanied a study order, see S2838
S2115 (Similar To) 2021-07-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S154 (Similar To) 2022-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see S2709
H3178 (Similar To) 2021-11-23 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 94 of the Acts of 2021
S876 (Similar To) 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
S2174 (Similar To) 2022-08-08 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H4252 (Similar To) 2022-01-20 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 5 of the Acts of 2022
H4360 (Similar To) 2022-08-02 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 93 of the Acts of 2022
S3091 (Similar To) 2022-08-11 - Message read and placed on file
S3083 (Similar To) 2022-07-31 - New draft (Cyr) substituted, see S3091
S3067 (Similar To) 2022-07-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see S3083